Bodin v. SAExploration Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Bodin
Defendant: Brent Whiteley, SAExploration Holdings, Inc., Brian Beatty and Jeff Hastings
Case Number: 4:2019cv03089
Filed: August 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Stipulation regarding time to respond to complaint. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SAExploration Holdings, Inc., filed.(Garcia, Yolanda)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re: Time to Respond to Complaint by SAExploration Holdings, Inc., filed.(Garcia, Yolanda)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Bodin, filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Phillip Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Stephen Shepardson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Stephen Shepardson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Bodin, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/13/2019. (Gresham, R.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Phillip Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Bodin, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/13/2019. (Gresham, R.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to SAExploration Holdings, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to SAExploration Holdings, Inc., filed.(Gresham, R.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Brian Beatty, Jeff Hastings, Brent Whiteley. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MelissaMorgan, 4)
August 18, 2019 Filing 5 Duplicate- Request for Issuance of Summons as to Brent Whiteley, filed.(Gresham, R.) Modified on 8/20/2019 (MelissaMorgan, 4).
August 18, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Brent Whiteley, filed.(Gresham, R.) Modified on 8/20/2019 to correct name of defendant. (MelissaMorgan, 4).
August 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Brian Beatty, filed.(Gresham, R.) Modified on 8/20/2019 to correct name of defendant. (MelissaMorgan, 4).
August 18, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jeff Hastings filed.(Gresham, R.) Modified on 8/20/2019 to correct name of defendant. (MelissaMorgan, 4).
August 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23000228) filed by John Bodin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gresham, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodin v. SAExploration Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bodin
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Stephen Shepardson
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Whiteley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAExploration Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Yolanda C Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?