International Baptist Church of Houston v. Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: International Baptist Church of Houston
Defendant: Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03105
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 7/26/2019 re: 12 Document(s) Sent, filed. (dhansen, 4)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Agreed Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION to Remand by International Baptist Church of Houston, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Willis, James)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for First-Party Insurance Property Damage Cases Arising from Disasters.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 **IMAGE DID NOT ATTACHED** ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for First-Party Insurance Property Damage Cases Arising from Disasters.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3) Modified on 9/12/2019 (SusanGram, 3).
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Melendi, Stephen)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by International Baptist Church of Houston, filed.(Willis, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by International Baptist Church of Houston, filed.(Willis, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge George C Hanks, Jr, pursuant to Special Order No. 2019-3. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect, and all court settings are vacated. Judge Sim Lake no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23011241) filed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Melendi, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Baptist Church of Houston v. Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Baptist Church of Houston
Represented By: James Winston Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen A Melendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?