Cruz v. Gonzalez
Petitioner: Ricardo Cruz-Santos and Ricardo Cruz
Respondent: Ed Gonzalez
Case Number: 4:2019cv03125
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Dismissed without prejudice for want of jurisdiction. Any and all pending motions are denied as moot. Case terminated on 9/5/2019 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Ricardo Cruz-Santos, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR. NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4) Modified on 8/21/2019 (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4). Modified on 8/21/2019 (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4).
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Ricardo Cruz-Santos.(ClaudiaGutierrez, 4) Modified on 8/21/2019 (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricardo Cruz-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricardo Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?