Simpson et al v. IASIS Health Care Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Keith Simpson and Tashika Simpson
Defendant: IASIS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, SJ MEDICAL CENTER, IASIS HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, INC and SJ Medical Center LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03140
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and/or 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e), and Brief in Support, filed.(Yeager, Celeste)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by IASIS Healthcare Holdings, Inc, Iasis Healthcare Corporation, SJ Medical Center LLC, filed.(Yeager, Celeste)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and/or 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e), and Brief in Support by IASIS Healthcare Holdings, Inc, Iasis Healthcare Corporation, SJ Medical Center LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - The Seaboard Injury Plan of Texas)(Yeager, Celeste)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Keith Simpson, Tashika Simpson, filed.(Schwartz, Newton)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to IASIS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, IASIS HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, INC, SJ MEDICAL CENTER. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Keith Simpson, Tashika Simpson, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Schwartz, Newton)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23033119) filed by Tashika Simpson, Keith Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Schwartz, Newton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. IASIS Health Care Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IASIS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION
Represented By: Celeste R Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJ MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IASIS HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, INC
Represented By: Celeste R Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJ Medical Center LLC
Represented By: Celeste R Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Simpson
Represented By: Newton Boris Schwartz, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tashika Simpson
Represented By: Newton Boris Schwartz, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?