Johnson et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JOHNSON and IRENE JOHNSON
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2019cv03147
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY in Support of #9 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Irene Johnson, Michael Johnson. (Zarghouni, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Opposed REPLY to Response to #9 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Kiss, Edward)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Irene Johnson, Michael Johnson, filed.(Zarghouni, Matthew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Irene Johnson, Michael Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. A, #2 Exhibit EX. B, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zarghouni, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to State Court and All Other Parties of Filing of Notice of Removal by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed. (Kressenberg, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed.(Kressenberg, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed.(Kressenberg, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 List of All Known Counsel of Record by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed.(Kressenberg, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Docket Sheet for County Court at Law No. 1, Harris County, Texas by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed.(Kressenberg, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Index of Document Being Filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed.(Kressenberg, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The 1st County Court at Law for Harris County, Texas, case number 1138043 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23037209) filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kressenberg, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John Mark Kressenberg
Represented By: Edward Charles Kiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JOHNSON
Represented By: Matthew M Zarghouni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRENE JOHNSON
Represented By: Matthew M Zarghouni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?