Majestic Oil, Inc. v. Underwriters at Lloyd's, London et al
Plaintiff: MAJESTIC OIL, INC.
Defendant: Beazley USA Services, Inc., Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623, Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623 and Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Case Number: 4:2019cv03149
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, filed.(Brown, Jay)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, filed. (Brown, Jay)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., with Jury Demand by Beazley USA Services, Inc., Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, filed.(Brown, Jay)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Partial Dismissal #12 . Beazley USA Services, Inc., Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623 and Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623 are dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623, Beazley USA Services, Inc. by Majestic Oil, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Nicholas)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Majestic Oil, Inc. filed by Majestic Oil, Inc..(Brown, Nicholas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Majestic Oil, Inc., filed.(Brown, Nicholas)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623, Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623, filed.(Gibson, Ethan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, filed.(Gibson, Ethan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Beazley USA Services, Inc., filed.(Gibson, Ethan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Beazley USA Services, Inc., Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623 filed by MAJESTIC OIL, INC.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by MAJESTIC OIL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gibson, Ethan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, filed.(Gibson, Ethan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23037724) filed by MAJESTIC OIL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibson, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Majestic Oil, Inc. v. Underwriters at Lloyd's, London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazley USA Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jay W Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Jay W Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAJESTIC OIL, INC.
Represented By: Ethan Graham Gibson
Represented By: Nicholas Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?