Thomas v. Ming
Plaintiff: Derrick Jr. Thomas
Defendant: Gao Ming and Keppel AmFELS, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03153
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gao Ming, filed.(Bain, Stephen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Keppel AmFELS, L.L.C., filed.(Shlimak, Kamilla)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney John Joseph Hopkins as to Derrick Jr. Thomas re: #4 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (agould, 3)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Service in Removed Action by Keppel AmFELS, L.L.C., filed.(Branca, Richard)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Keppel AmFELS, L.L.C. identifying Keppel Offshore & Marine USA Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Shlimak, Kamilla)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Removal by Keppel AmFELS, L.L.C., Gao Ming, filed.(Shlimak, Kamilla)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County 61st District, case number 2018-83430 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23039235) filed by Keppel AmFELS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index to Notice of Removal Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A to Removal, #3 Exhibit B to Removal, #4 Exhibit C to Removal, #5 Exhibit D to Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Branca, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Ming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gao Ming
Represented By: Kamilla Shlimak
Represented By: Stephen D Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keppel AmFELS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kamilla Shlimak
Represented By: Richard Anthony Branca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Jr. Thomas
Represented By: John Joseph Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?