Manchester Terminal, LLC v. R & R Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Manchester Terminal, LLC
Defendant: R & R Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03162
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Manchester Terminal, LLC, filed.(Evans, Christopher)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Manchester Terminal, LLC, filed.(Evans, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County 61st Judicial District, case number 2019-45285 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23041260) filed by R & R Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit List of Parties and Counsel, #3 Exhibit Harris County Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Index of Pleadings, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #6 Exhibit R&R Contracting, Inc.'s Original Answer, #7 Exhibit Request for Issuance of Service, #8 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal)(Jacobellis, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manchester Terminal, LLC v. R & R Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & R Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Jacobellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manchester Terminal, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?