Linnus et al v. Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
Plaintiff: Sarah J. Linnus and William A. Linnus
Defendant: Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
Case Number: 4:2019cv03163
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition to Defendant's Reply and Brief of its Motion to Abate re: #14 Brief by Sarah J. Linnus, William A. Linnus, filed.(Corona, Jesse)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF Support re: #5 MOTION to Abate by Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas, filed.(Conder, Dennis)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Initial conference held on October 8, 2019. The court ordered Metropolitan to submit a brief about the matters discussed on the record by October 11, 2019. The plaintiffs response is due on October 18, 2019. Appearances: Jesse Corona for Pltfs. and Dennis Conder(by phone) for Deft.(Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz), filed.(leddins, 4)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Abate, filed by Sarah J. Linnus, William A. Linnus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corona, Jesse)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Initial Discovery Responses per First Party Property Disputes by William A. Linnus, filed. (Corona, Jesse)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas, filed. (Conder, Dennis)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order, filed.(Corona, Jesse)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by William A. Linnus, filed.(Corona, Jesse)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by William A. Linnus, filed.(Corona, Jesse)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Abate by Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Abate)(Conder, Dennis)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for First-Party Insurance Property Damage Cases Arising from Disasters.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas, filed.(Conder, Dennis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st District Court, case number 2019-46919 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23041691) filed by Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit)(Conder, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linnus et al v. Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah J. Linnus
Represented By: Jesse S. Corona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Linnus
Represented By: Jesse S. Corona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By: Dennis D Conder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?