Kinder Morgan, Inc. and subsidiaries v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: Kinder Morgan, Inc. and subsidiaries
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, CHARLES P. RETTIG, Commissioner, Internal Revenue Service, in his official capacity, MICK MULVANEY, Director, Office of Management and Budget, in his official capacity, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Charles P. Rettig, Commissioner Internal Revenue Service, in his official capacity
Case Number: 4:2019cv03233
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for All Defendants 01/02/2020.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
October 23, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johns, Michelle)
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 RETURN of Service, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service (U.S. Attorney's Office Southern District of Texas))(Wilcox, Jason)
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to United States of America served on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service (Attorney General of the United States))(Wilcox, Jason)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Office of Management and Budget served on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Wilcox, Jason)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Mick Mulvaney, Director, Office of Management and Budget, in his official Capacity served on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Wilcox, Jason)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Internal Revenue Service served on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Wilcox, Jason)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Charles P. Rettig, Commissioner Internal Revenue Service, in his official capacity served on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Wilcox, Jason)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kinder Morgan, Inc. and subsidiaries, filed.(Rotman, Anna)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Megan Wold to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for John C. O'Quinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Jason Wilcox to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge George C Hanks, Jr, pursuant to Special Order No. 2019-3. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect, and all court settings are vacated. Judge Nancy F Atlas no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Megan Wold to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kinder Morgan, Inc. and subsidiaries, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Bar Admissions of Megan Wold)(Rotman, Anna)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for John C. O'Quinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kinder Morgan, Inc. and subsidiaries, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Bar Admissions of John C. O'Quinn)(Rotman, Anna)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Jason Wilcox to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kinder Morgan, Inc. and subsidiaries, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Bar Admissions of Jason Wilcox)(Rotman, Anna)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, Mick Mulvaney, Director, Office of Management and Budget, in his official Capacity, Office of Management and Budget, Charles P. Rettig, Commissioner Internal Revenue Service, in his official capacity, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation 2019-08-27 United States Attorney's Office Summons, #2 Continuation 2019-08-27 The Office of Management and Budget Summons, #3 Continuation 2019-08-27 Director Mick Mulvaney Summons, #4 Continuation 2019-08-27 IRS Summons, #5 Continuation 2019-08-27 Commissioner Charles P. Rettig Summons)(Rotman, Anna)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kinder Morgan, Inc. and subsidiaries, filed.(Rotman, Anna)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Kinder Morgan, Inc. and subsidiaries, filed.(Rotman, Anna)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23065808) filed by Kinder Morgan, Inc. and subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - 2016 Federal Form 851, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - 2017 Federal Form 851)(Rotman, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinder Morgan, Inc. and subsidiaries v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES P. RETTIG, Commissioner, Internal Revenue Service, in his official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICK MULVANEY, Director, Office of Management and Budget, in his official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michelle C Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles P. Rettig, Commissioner Internal Revenue Service, in his official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinder Morgan, Inc. and subsidiaries
Represented By: Anna Rotman
Represented By: John C. O'Quinn
Represented By: Jason Wilcox
Represented By: Megan Wold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?