Banks, et al v. Experian, Transunion and Equifax Credit Reporting Agencies
Plaintiff: Jamaine Banks and Anika Banks
Defendant: Experian, Transunion and Equifax Credit Reporting Agencies
Case Number: 4:2019cv03318
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Other EXHIBITS by Anika Banks, Jamaine Banks, filed.(lcorbett, 7)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
September 3, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to Experian, Transunion and Equifax Credit Reporting Agencies as Summons are deficient. Name/Address of Plaintiff Attorney or Plaintff not present. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Experian, Transunion and Equifax Credit Reporting Agencies filed by Jamaine Banks, Anika Banks. (Application to Proceed IFP Granted on 8/30/2019 by Judge Bennett). (jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks, et al v. Experian, Transunion and Equifax Credit Reporting Agencies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamaine Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anika Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian, Transunion and Equifax Credit Reporting Agencies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?