Oliver, Jr. v. MUY Pizza Houston, LLC
Defendant: Muy Pizza Houston, LLC, d/b/a Pizza Hut and Willie Charles Oliver, Jr
Case Number: 4:2019cv03412
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by MUY Pizza Houston, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simmons, Larry)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MUY Pizza Houston, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to MUY Pizza Houston, LLC, filed.(Richey, Sara)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Muy Pizza Houston, LLC, d/b/a Pizza Hut (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23148376) filed by Willie Charles Oliver, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Consent- Willie Oliver, Jr)(Richey, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver, Jr. v. MUY Pizza Houston, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muy Pizza Houston, LLC, d/b/a Pizza Hut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Charles Oliver, Jr
Represented By: Sara Beth Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?