O'Neil v. Diamond Bolt, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott A O'Neil
Defendant: Diamond Bolt, Inc., Amy Bright, Maurice Stewart Bright, Maurice S Bright and Stewart Bright
Case Number: 4:2019cv03434
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service re: #5 Order for Conference - FORM - Hughes by Scott A O'Neil, filed. (Jackson, Daniel)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Scott A O'Neil, filed.(Jackson, Daniel)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diamond Bolt, Inc., filed.(Sullivan, Edwin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Amy Bright, Maurice S Bright, Diamond Bolt, Inc., filed.(Sullivan, Edwin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Amy Bright, Maurice S Bright, Diamond Bolt, Inc., filed.(Sullivan, Edwin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Amy Bright served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019, filed.(rcastro, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Diamond Bolt, Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019, filed.(SamanthaWarda, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Maurice S Bright served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019, filed.(SamanthaWarda, 4)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Amy Bright, Maurice S Bright, Diamond Bolt, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amy Bright, filed.(Jackson, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Maurice Stewart Bright, filed.(Jackson, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Diamond Bolt, Inc., filed.(Jackson, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23159297) filed by Scott A O'Neil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jackson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neil v. Diamond Bolt, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Bolt, Inc.
Represented By: Edwin Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Bright
Represented By: Edwin Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Stewart Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice S Bright
Represented By: Edwin Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Bright
Represented By: Edwin Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A O'Neil
Represented By: Daniel W Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?