Jackson v. Azar
Plaintiff: Michelle Jackson
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 4:2019cv03445
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:2345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Answer or Other Response due by 12/20/2019.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Alex M. Azar, II, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff via NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JenniferOlson, 4)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23167132) filed by Michelle Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Summons, #2 Complaint Summons, #3 Complaint Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit Exhibit R)(Presutti, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Jackson
Represented By: Richard J Presutti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?