Princeton Excess Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Houston Independent School District et al
Plaintiff: Princeton Excess Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: Houston Independent School District and DynaStudy, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03474
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 10/04/2019 (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
September 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Houston Independent School District by Princeton Excess Surplus Lines Insurance Company, filed. (Taylor, Natasha)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Houston Independent School District. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Jordan S. Steinway to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Jordon S. Steinway to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Princeton Excess Surplus Lines Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Attorney Statement)(Taylor, Natasha)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Houston Independent School District, filed.(Taylor, Natasha)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(hcarr, 4)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Houston Independent School District filed by Princeton Excess Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Taylor, Natasha)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23176871) filed by Princeton Excess Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Jury Verdict, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 6/11/2019 PESLIC Letter, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 9/5/2019 Email, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - 9/9/2019 Email, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - PESLIC Policy, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Natasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Princeton Excess Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Houston Independent School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DynaStudy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princeton Excess Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Natasha Taylor
Represented By: Jordon S Steinway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?