Hamilton v. Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Plaintiff: Deborah Hamilton
Defendant: Senior Lifestyle Corporation, d/b/a Greatwood at Sugar Land Independent Living and Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv03481
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Alexander M. Baggio to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Senior Lifestyle Corporation, filed.(Baggio, Alexander)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent by Deborah Hamilton, filed. (Lawson, Nicholas)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Alexander M. Baggio to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Senior Lifestyle Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2019. (Baggio, Alexander)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Resetting as to #6 Order for Initial Conference - FORM - Hoyt. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 08:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt, filed. (chorace)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Senior Lifestyle Corporation, d/b/a Greatwood at Sugar Land Independent Living served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019, filed.(Lawson, Nicholas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Senior Lifestyle Corporation, d/b/a Greatwood at Sugar Land Independent Living. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 2/17/2020 at 08:30 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Senior Lifestyle Corporation, d/b/a Greatwood at Sugar Land Independent Living, filed.(Lawson, Nicholas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Senior Lifestyle Corporation, d/b/a Greatwood at Sugar Land Independent Living filed by Deborah Hamilton. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Deborah Hamilton.(Lawson, Nicholas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Senior Lifestyle Corporation, d/b/a Greatwood at Sugar Land Independent Living. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Senior Lifestyle Corporation, d/b/a Greatwood at Sugar Land Independent Living, filed.(Lawson, Nicholas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Senior Lifestyle Corporation, d/b/a Greatwood at Sugar Land Independent Living (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23177832) filed by Deborah Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lawson, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Hamilton
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Lifestyle Corporation, d/b/a Greatwood at Sugar Land Independent Living
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Represented By: Alexander M. Baggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?