James v. Walker-Smith et al
Plaintiff: Ajshay James
Defendant: Ricardo Quinonez, Marilyn Polk, Candace J. Broussard-White, Azelia Walker-Smith, Katie C. Evans, Sherry Gomez, Amy Lynn Small, Monica Sanders, Ericka Davis, Shelly Martin, Cara G. Lye and Jeanine Graf
Case Number: 4:2019cv03485
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ricardo Quinonez, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Burrus, Elizabeth)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cara G. Lye, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Burrus, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jeanine Graf, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Burrus, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jeanine Graf, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Complaint)(Burrus, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Katie C. Evans, Amy Lynn Small, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Serpe, John)
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Candace J. Broussard-White, Monica Sanders, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graydon, Scot)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS and Complaint Executed as to Candace J. Broussard-White served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS and Complaint Executed as to Marilyn Polk served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS and Complaint Executed as to Azelia Walker-Smith served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ericka Davis served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Monica Sanders served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019, filed.(jdav, 4)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Shelly Martin, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Graydon, Scot)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service executed as to Sherry Gomez., filed.(jdav, 4)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS and COMPLAINT Executed as to Sherry Gomez served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ricardo Quinonez served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Cara G. Lye served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019, filed.(jtabares, 1)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Katie C. Evans served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019, filed.(agould, 3)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Amy Lynn Small served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019, filed.(agould, 3)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Jeanine Graf served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019, filed.(agould, 3)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Shelly Martin served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
October 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to US Marshals Office, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
September 16, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to All Defendants as Name/Address of Plaintiff not present. Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by First-class mail, filed.(jdav, 4)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Candace J. Broussard-White, Ericka Davis, Katie C. Evans, Sherry Gomez, Jeanine Graf, Cara G. Lye, Shelly Martin, Marilyn Polk, Ricardo Quinonez, Monica Sanders, Amy Lynn Small, Azelia Walker-Smith filed by Ajshay James. (Application to Proceed IFP Conditionally Granted on 9/13/2019 by Judge Keith Ellison). (Attachments: #1 summons)(jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Walker-Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Quinonez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace J. Broussard-White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azelia Walker-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie C. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Lynn Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericka Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara G. Lye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanine Graf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ajshay James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?