Montgomey v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: Bert Douglas Montgomey
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2019cv03496
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 88:8888
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Jerry Bacon re: Support of Plaintiff, filed. (ealexander, 4)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Herbert L. Kalman re: Support of Plaintiff, filed. (ealexander, 4)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 CONCLUSION by Bert Douglas Montgomey, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by Bert Douglas Montgomey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SarahShelby, 4)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #5 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Bert Douglas Montgomey, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by Bert Douglas Montgomey. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Bert Douglas Montgomey.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Truth filed by Bert D. Montgomery, filed.(thanniable, 4)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Plaintiff, filed.(mmapps, 4)
September 16, 2019 Civil Filing fee: $400 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU091129, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by Bert Douglas Montgomey. (Attachments: #1 Continuation), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (BrendaLacy, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomey v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bert Douglas Montgomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?