Contreras v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Erendida Contreras
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03515
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION to Remand, filed by Erendida Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buzbee, Anthony)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schexnyder, LaDonna)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Erendida Contreras, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Buzbee, Anthony)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Resetting Conference terminating #7 . Initial Conference reset for 12/5/2019 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Pre-Trial Conference by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schexnyder, LaDonna)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Schexnyder, LaDonna)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Erendida Contreras, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Buzbee, Anthony)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Initial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Edwards, Christine)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 234th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-59111 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23193798) filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Index of Items Being Filed, #5 State Court Record, #6 List of all Parties and Counsel of Record, #7 Certificate of Interested Parties, #8 Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Schexnyder, LaDonna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erendida Contreras
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Represented By: Stephen Rolfe Walker
Represented By: Christopher Jerrod Leavitt
Represented By: Gregory Jay Finney
Represented By: Juan Alejandro Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: LaDonna Grey Schexnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?