Conder v. U.S. Department of Treasury et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel H. Conder, III
Defendant: U.S. Department of Treasury, Social Security Administration and Internal Revenue Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2019cv03552
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service Executed as to Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General of the United States on 10/31/19 re: Summons, filed.(sguevara, 4)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Internal Revenue Commissioner served on 10/30/2019, answer due 12/30/2019, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service Executed as to Ryan K. Patrick - U.S. Atty for the SDTX on 10/11/19 re: Summons, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 24, 2019 Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons delivered to the USM for service, along w/ USM-285 forms, and copies of complaint, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Nathaniel H. Conder, III, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(thanniable, 4)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nathaniel H. Conder, III. (Plaintiff granted IFP status in related case 4:19mc2782). (LoriPurifoy, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conder v. U.S. Department of Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel H. Conder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?