County of Jim Wells v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff: County of Jim Wells
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., Abbott Laboratories, McKesson Corporation, Walgreen Co, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Purdue Pharma, L.P., CVS Health Corporation, Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Walmart Stores Inc, Cardinal Health Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Amerisource Bergen Corporation and Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03580
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch as to Allergan PLC re: #8 Order, Set/Clear Flags, filed. (dwilkerson, 3) ** Firm address updated ** DE #8 renoticed.
October 23, 2019 RECEIPT of Transfer received via email notification re: transfer of case to Northern District of Ohio. New Case # assigned: 1:19-op-45884 and received on 10/23/2019., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
October 16, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-114) transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER entered: CVS's motion to stay, (Docket Entry No. 6), is granted. The motion to remand, (Docket Entry No. 5), is denied, without prejudice to reassertion.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM In Support of re: #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidisrict Litigation by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Torian, Mark)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidisrict Litigation by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henderson, Jay)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Corrected MOTION for Confidential Treatment of file earlier as "agreed" which was not correct( Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019.), Corrected MOTION for Entry of Order re: Motion to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. (Henderson, Jay)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by CVS Healthcare Corporation for a Temporary Stay Pending Transfer, filed by County of Jim Wells. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fibich, Kenneth)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETED IN ERROR. MOTION to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fibich, Kenneth)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court, Harris County, case number 201949073 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23226017) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Torian, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Jim Wells v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Joel Cameron Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: James G Martingano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Joel Cameron Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Donna M Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Represented By: Laura Jane Durfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Bergen Corporation
Represented By: Michael Halley Bernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Jim Wells
Represented By: Armando G Barrera
Represented By: J. Javier Gutierrez
Represented By: Shelly A. Sanford
Represented By: Kathryn Snapka
Represented By: Baldemar F Gutierrez
Represented By: Joseph Michael Guerra
Represented By: Mikal C Watts
Represented By: Jay Hodges Henderson
Represented By: Kenneth T Fibich
Represented By: Michael T Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?