County of Angelina v. Allergan PLC, et al
Plaintiff: County of Angelina
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Atlas Holdings, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis, PLC; Actavis, LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a A Watson Pharma, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. d/b/a Par Pharmaceutical, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Wal-Mart Inc. f/k/a Walmart Stores, Inc., Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, a wholly-owned subsidiary of AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Walgreen Co., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., and The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Does 1-100, The Purdue Frederick Company, Wal-Mart Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Walgreen Co., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03590
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by County of Angelina. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit Compedium of Cases)(Simon, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY in Support of #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, filed by CVS Health Corporation, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Torian, Mark)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Smyser, Craig)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #4 Notice (Other) , filed by County of Angelina. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit Johnson County Remand, #3 Exhibit Arlington County Remand, #4 Exhibit Compendium of Cases, #5 Exhibit List of Parties)(Simon, Jeffrey)
November 11, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, filed by County of Angelina. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit Opinion re Order to form TX MDL, #3 Exhibit JPML Heaing Agenda, #4 Exhibit JPML Schedule, #5 Exhibit Order Moratorium on Filings, #6 Exhibit Letter to Judge Polster, #7 Exhibit Johnson County Remand, #8 Exhibit Arlington County Remand, #9 Exhibit Jefferson Order, #10 Exhibit Cajun Offshore Charters v BP, #11 Exhibit City of Galax v Purdue, #12 Exhibit City of Granite City v Amerisourcebergen, #13 Exhibit City of Reno v Purdue, #14 Exhibit City of Worcester v Purdue, #15 Exhibit Curnow v Stryker, #16 Exhibit Custer v Cerro Flow, #17 Exhibit Del ex rel Denn v Purdue, #18 Exhibit Dinwiddie Cty v Purdue, #19 Exhibit Esquivel v BP, #20 Exhibit Ill Pub Risk Fund v Purdue, #21 Exhibit In re Asbestos Litig, #22 Exhibit In re Nat'l Prescription Opiate Litig, #23 Exhibit In re Nat'l Prescription Opiate Litig, #24 Exhibit Mecklenburg Cty v Purdue, #25 Exhibit Megill v Worthington Pump, #26 Exhibit Nguyen v BP, #27 Exhibit Sundby v Bank of NY, #28 Exhibit Tenn Consol Ret Sys v Citigroup, #29 Exhibit Tucson Med Ctr v Purdue, #30 Exhibit Uintah Cty v Purdue, #31 Exhibit Uzee v Huntington Ingalls, #32 Exhibit W Va ex rel McGraw v Bristol Myers, #33 Exhibit W Va ex rel Morrisey v McKesson, #34 Exhibit W Va ex rel Morrisey v Pfizer, #35 Exhibit Weber Cty v Purdue, #36 Exhibit, #37 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Expedited Response re: #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Response to Motion due by 11/11/2019.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of re: #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, McKesson Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Torian, Mark)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, McKesson Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by County of Angelina, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit CMO 1, #3 Exhibit Distributors' First Amended Rule 91a Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Orders Denying Distributors' First Amended Rule 91a Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion of the Court of Appeals for the First District of Texas, #6 Exhibit Supreme Court of Texas Orders Pronounced October 18, 2019, #7 Exhibit Transcript of July 26, 2019 Hearing in Texas MDL, #8 Exhibit Transcript of October 4, 2019 Hearing in Texas MDL, #9 Exhibit List of Participating PPV Facilities in Texas, #10 Exhibit McKesson Press Release dated January 17, 2017, #11 Exhibit City of Granite City, IL v AmerisourceBergen, #12 Exhibit City of Reno v Purdue Pharma, #13 Exhibit Custer v Cerro Flow Prods, #14 Exhibit Delaware ex rel Denn v Purdue Pharma, #15 Exhibit Dinwiddie County, VA v Purdue Pharma, #16 Exhibit Dougherty v A.O. Smith Corp, #17 Exhibit Illinois Pub Risk Fund v Purdue Pharma, #18 Exhibit In re Asbestos Litig, #19 Exhibit In re Nat'l Prescription Opiate Litig, #20 Exhibit In re Nat'l Prescription Opiate Litig, #21 Exhibit In re Opioid Litigation, #22 Exhibit Kaye v Sw Airlines Co, #23 Exhibit Kelleher v A.W. Chesterton Co., #24 Exhibit Kerstetter v Pacific Sci. Co., #25 Exhibit Lara v CBS Corp, #26 Exhibit Megill v Worthington Pump, Inc., #27 Exhibit Preswett v Goulds Pumps, #28 Exhibit Schulz v Crane Co, #29 Exhibit Siders v 20th Century Glove Corp, #30 Exhibit State of West Virginia ex rel Morrisey v McKesson Corp, #31 Exhibit Tucson Med Ctr v Purdue Pharma, #32 Exhibit Uintah County, Utah v Purdue Pharma, #33 Exhibit Uzee v Huntington Ingalls Inc., #34 Exhibit Walek v Boeing Co, #35 Exhibit Weber County, Utah v Purdue Pharma, #36 Exhibit List of Parties and Counsel, #37 Proposed Order)(Neil, JoDee)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Removal by CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Torian, Mark)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Smyser, Craig)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by McKesson Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Smyser, Craig)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court of Harris County, case number 2018-87846 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23227938) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Smyser, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Angelina v. Allergan PLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Atlas Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis, PLC; Actavis, LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a A Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. d/b/a Par Pharmaceutical, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc. f/k/a Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, a wholly-owned subsidiary of AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., and The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Angelina
Represented By: Jeffrey Blake Simon
Represented By: JoDee Lee Neil
Represented By: Paul Dunford Henderson
Represented By: David Dies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?