Romar/MEC LLC v. Tank Welding LLC
Plaintiff: Romar/MEC LLC
Defendant: Tank Welding LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03616
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE #8 Agreed MOTION Joint Motion to Dismiss. Case terminated on 11/18/2019 (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
November 16, 2019 Filing 8 Agreed MOTION Joint Motion to Dismiss by Romar/MEC LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Renshaw, Justin)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED ORDER granting #6 Motion for Protective Order. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Tank Welding LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fasthoff, Henry)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Romar/MEC LLC, filed.(Renshaw, Justin)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tank Welding LLC served on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019, filed.(Fasthoff, Henry)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (SarahShelbyadi, 4)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23239132) filed by Romar/MEC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fit Up Gear TESS Registration)(Renshaw, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romar/MEC LLC v. Tank Welding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tank Welding LLC
Represented By: Henry James Fasthoff, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romar/MEC LLC
Represented By: Justin William Renshaw
Represented By: Kim Elaine Conkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?