Griffin v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Griffin
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Sebring Capital Partners, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 4:2019cv03679
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/20/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of Facts by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, filed.(Bodoff, Rebekkah)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, filed.(Bodoff, Rebekkah)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, filed.(Bodoff, Rebekkah)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County JDC, case number 189 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23258258) filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Bodoff, Rebekkah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Rebekkah B Bodoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebring Capital Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Rebekkah B Bodoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Rebekkah B Bodoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Griffin
Represented By: Rhonda Shedrick Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?