Odom v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Odom Timothy and Timothy Odom
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Tiffany Aston, as Trustee for the Polo Meadow Trust
Case Number: 4:2019cv03742
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY in Support of #12 MOTION to Remand, filed by Tiffany Aston, as Trustee for the Polo Meadow Trust. (Jackson, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durell, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Tiffany Aston, as Trustee for the Polo Meadow Trust, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles Eskridge, pursuant to Special Order No. 2019-4. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect, and all court settings are vacated. Judge Vanessa D Gilmore no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (NicoleDiaz, 4)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 Lis Pendens by Timothy Odom, Tiffany Aston, as Trustee for the Polo Meadow Trust, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Timothy Odom, Tiffany Aston, as Trustee for the Polo Meadow Trust, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Second SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 2)(Durell, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 First SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 1)(Durell, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Jackson on behalf of Odom Timothy, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Lance Krolikowski on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, filed. (Krolikowski, Kurt)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Jackson on behalf of Tiffany Aston, as Trustee for the Polo Meadow Trust, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, filed.(Durell, Daniel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2017-08327 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23271231) filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - List of Counsel, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Docket Sheet, Pleadings and Orders, #5 Exhibit E - Houston CAD property information)(Durell, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odom v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Glenn Durell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Glenn Durell
Represented By: Kurt Lance Krolikowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Tiffany Aston, as Trustee for the Polo Meadow Trust
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odom Timothy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Odom
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?