Zachary v. Harris County Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Tara Zachary
Defendant: Joe Ellis, Harris County Housing Authority, Dr. Adriana Tamez, Joe Villarreal, Horace Allison, Kerry Wright, Gerald Womack and Gerald Womak
Case Number: 4:2019cv03804
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Horace Allison, Joe Ellis, Harris County Housing Authority, Adriana Tamez, Joe Villarreal, Gerald Womak, Kerry Wright, filed.(Lemond, Scott)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tara Zachary, filed.(Lopez, Melinda)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tara Zachary.(Lopez, Melinda)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Agreed PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Agreed Proposed Pretrial Order by Tara Zachary(Lopez, Melinda)
October 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 10/7/2019. On the Parties joint oral motion, the Court entered a preliminary injunction against Defendants with the same terms as the TRO previously issued by the 61st District Court of Harris County. Plaintiff has 10 days to amend her complaint. Appearances: Scott Lemond, Melinda Rene Lopez.(Court Reporter: K. Miller)(Law Clerk: K. Schiffman), filed.(arrivera, 4)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Setting as to #3 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 10/7/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. TIME CHANGE ONLY. (arrivera, 4)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing re: #3 set for 10/7/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Tara Zachary, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lopez, Melinda)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 61st Judicial District of Harris County. Texas, case number 2019-69284 () filed by Joe Ellis, Gerald Womack, Kerry Wright, Horace Allison, Harris County Housing Authority, Joe Villarreal, Adriana Tamez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Plan, #2 Exhibit HUD/DOJ Joint Statement, #3 Exhibit HUD Notice PIH 2010-26, #4 Exhibit Brown v. Harris County Housing Authority, #5 Exhibit No State Court Processes, #6 Exhibit State Court Orders, #7 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit List of all Counsel of Record, #9 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 6, State Court Pleadings, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, Index of Matters Being Filed)(Lemond, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zachary v. Harris County Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Zachary
Represented By: Melinda Rene Lopez
Represented By: Evan Brian Crocker
Represented By: Mark J Grandich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Ellis
Represented By: Scott Lemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris County Housing Authority
Represented By: Scott Lemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Adriana Tamez
Represented By: Scott Lemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Villarreal
Represented By: Scott Lemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace Allison
Represented By: Scott Lemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Wright
Represented By: Scott Lemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Womack
Represented By: Scott Lemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Womak
Represented By: Scott Lemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?