United States of America v. $1,555,953.56 U.S. Currency Seized From SunTrust Account 7706
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $1,555,953.56 U.S. Currency Seized From SunTrust Account 7706
Case Number: 4:2019cv03834
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service Executed as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security USSS on October 17, 2019 re: Warrant of Arrest in Rem, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service Executed as to James E. Dellinger on October 9, 2019 re: Complaint for Forfeiture, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Service of Complaint, #2 Proof of Delivery)(Rollinson, Kristine)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
October 8, 2019 Warrant of Arrest In Rem. Delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(rcastro, 4)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States of America, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $1,555,953.56 U.S. Currency Seized From SunTrust Account 7706 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Rollinson, Kristine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $1,555,953.56 U.S. Currency Seized From SunTrust Account 7706
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,555,953.56 U.S. Currency Seized From SunTrust Account 7706
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kristine E Rollinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?