Gomez v. ALN International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LEONARDO GOMEZ
Defendant: ALN International, Inc. and ALN Implants Chirurgicaux
Case Number: 4:2019cv03852
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Leonardo Gomez, filed.(Bruera, Sofia)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Leonardo Gomez, filed.(Bruera, Sofia)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ALN Implants Chirurgicaux, ALN International, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to LEONARDO GOMEZ, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Bruera, Sofia)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEONARDO GOMEZ (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23310740) filed by LEONARDO GOMEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bruera, Sofia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. ALN International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALN International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALN Implants Chirurgicaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARDO GOMEZ
Represented By: Sofia E Bruera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?