Axip Energy Services, LP v. CSI Acquisition Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Axip Energy Services, LP
Defendant: Crane Service, Inc., JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC COMPANIES 1-10, XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 and CSI Acquisition Company LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03887
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Axip Energy Services, LP. (Mast, Gregory)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CSI Acquisition Company LLC, filed.(Beliveaux, Ian)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CSI Acquisition Company LLC, filed.(Beliveaux, Ian)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CSI Acquisition Company LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2019. (Beliveaux, Ian)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to CSI Acquisition Company LLC served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019, filed.(Mast, Gregory)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Crane Service, Inc. served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019, filed.(Mast, Gregory)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CSI Acquisition Company LLC, Crane Service, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Axip Energy Services, LP, filed.(Mast, Gregory)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to CSI Acquisition Company LLC, Crane Service, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Mast, Gregory)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23324161) filed by Axip Energy Services, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Mast, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axip Energy Services, LP v. CSI Acquisition Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSI Acquisition Company LLC
Represented By: Ian Ranier Beliveaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axip Energy Services, LP
Represented By: Gregory Lee Mast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?