Visual Comfort of America LLC v. Savoy House
Plaintiff: Visual Comfort of America LLC
Defendant: Savoy House and Progressive Lighting, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03936
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Seth Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Progressive Lighting, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/4/2019. (Stevenson, Christopher)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Progressive Lighting, Inc., filed.(Stevenson, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 DESIGNATION of Edmund J. Ferdinand, III as attorney in charge of Visual Comfort of America LLC, filed.(Pearce, Andrew)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Edmund Ferdinand, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Progressive Lighting, Inc. served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019, filed.(Pearce, Andrew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Visual Comfort of America LLC, filed.(Pearce, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case by Visual Comfort of America LLC, filed. (Pearce, Andrew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (SarahShelbyadi, 4)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Progressive Lighting, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Savoy House, filed.(Pearce, Andrew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Edmund J. Ferdinand, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visual Comfort of America LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2019. (Pearce, Andrew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Savoy House (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23347017) filed by Visual Comfort of America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Pearce, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Visual Comfort of America LLC v. Savoy House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Visual Comfort of America LLC
Represented By: Andrew Delatin Pearce
Represented By: Whitney Brieck
Represented By: Edmund J Ferdinand, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savoy House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Lighting, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Alfred Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?