Exxon Mobil Corporation v. Cullen Mobil Auto Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Defendant: Cullen Mobil Auto Service, Inc. and Izza, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03964
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2019 Filing 12 Consent Final Judgment by Exxon Mobil Corporation, filed.(Smith, Tyson)
November 29, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 11/29/19(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Izza, Inc. served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019, filed.(Smith, Tyson)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Cullen Mobil Auto Service, Inc. served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019, filed.(Smith, Tyson)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/17/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment. Parties notified, filed. (aboyd, 4)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Sim Lake recused. Case reassigned to Judge Keith P Ellison for all further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Exxon Mobil Corporation, filed.(Meleen, Stephen)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons on Izza, Inc.)(Meleen, Stephen)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23353656) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meleen, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exxon Mobil Corporation v. Cullen Mobil Auto Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cullen Mobil Auto Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Izza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Stephen P Meleen
Represented By: Tyson David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?