Ledge Lounger, Inc. v. Aqua Chairs, LLC
Plaintiff: Ledge Lounger, Inc.
Defendant: Aqua Chairs, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03995
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Extension ORDER. By 1/13/2020, Aqua Chairs, LLC, must answer or otherwise respond #14 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Aqua Chairs, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Extension ORDER. By 12/12/2019, Aqua Chairs must answer #12 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to answer complaint by Aqua Chairs, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Aqua Chairs, LLC served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019, filed.(Berghammer, Joseph)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Michael L. Krashin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Scott A. Burow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Aqua Chairs, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Michael L. Krashin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ledge Lounger, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2019. (Berghammer, Joseph)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Scott A. Burow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ledge Lounger, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2019. (Berghammer, Joseph)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ledge Lounger, Inc., filed.(Berghammer, Joseph)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Aqua Chairs, LLC, filed.(Berghammer, Joseph)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aqua Chairs, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23361156) filed by Ledge Lounger, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berghammer, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledge Lounger, Inc. v. Aqua Chairs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua Chairs, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Lance Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledge Lounger, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J Berghammer
Represented By: Michael L Krashin
Represented By: Scott A. Burow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?