Knotts v. Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Knotts
Defendant: Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc and Dylan McKenzie Guerin
Case Number: 4:2019cv04087
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc, filed. (Burck, Howard)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling & DCO)(Burck, Howard)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc, filed.(Burck, Howard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 129th District Court, case number 2019-72243 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23392840) filed by Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Burck, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knotts v. Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Knotts
Represented By: Brent Michael Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Bulk Carriers Inc
Represented By: Howard Mark Burck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan McKenzie Guerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?