De La Vega v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: ADRIAN DE LA VEGA
Defendant: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATE and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 4:2019cv04099
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE and Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal as to Adrian De La Vega by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed. (Sheppard, Branch)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by Adrian De La Vega, filed. (Hyde, Jacob)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Sheppard, Branch)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Annarose M. Harding on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon, filed. (Harding, Annarose)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on Non-Interference. The pendency of this case will be no impediment to the executions of orders already obtained from another court. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Management ORDER. By 11/29/29, The Bank of New York Mellon may move. By 12/9/19, Adrian De La Vega may respond. By 12/19/19, the bank may reply. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Initial Conference held. Appearances: Jacob B Hyde, Branch Masterson Sheppard, Annarose Harding. Ct Reporter: G. Dye. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 12/23/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed.(Sheppard, Branch)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: Initial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 02:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed.(Sheppard, Branch)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed.(Sheppard, Branch)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd JUDICIAL DISTRICT of HARRIS COUNTY, case number 201962500 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23396053) filed by THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Case Information Sheet)(Sheppard, Branch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Vega v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIAN DE LA VEGA
Represented By: Jacob B Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATE
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Represented By: Annarose Marie Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?