Patterson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Nicole Patterson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv04137
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of Summons Executed as to the Department of Justice served on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020, filed.(SarahShelby, 4) (Main Document 7 replaced to correct PDF on 11/26/2019) (SarahShelby, 4).
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Andrew Saul served on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service Executed as to U.S. Attorney on 10/31/2019 re: Complaint and Summons, filed.(agould, 3)
October 24, 2019 ***Copies of Summonses, Complaint, Order and USM-285 hand-delivered to USMS, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF(SarahShelby, 4)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Andrew Saul, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, REgion VI; The United States Attorney for the Southern District of Texas;The Attorney General of the United States, filed.(Dewberry, Donald)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Not Issued as to Andrew Saul - Plaintiff failed to submit with complaint properly completed Summons & USM-285. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF. Blank copies of Summons and USM-285 provided to Pltf, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Blank Form, #2 USM 285 - Blank Form)(sanderson, 4)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Nicole Patterson. (Application to Proceed IFP Granted on 10/22/19 by Judge Vanessa DE. Gilmore) (Attachments: #1 Order Granting IFP (4:19-mc-3079))(sanderson, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Patterson
Represented By: Donald Clifton Dewberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?