Blunt v. Davis
Petitioner: Lamonn Eugene Blunt
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Case Number: 4:2019cv04145
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Sec. 2254 Habeas Corpus by Lamonn Eugene Blunt, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Petition's Affidavit of Truth in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope)(jdav, 4)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Brodbeck on behalf of Lorie Davis, filed. (Brodbeck, Lori)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 11/19/2019 re: 6 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (gkelner, 4)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Mail Receipt Returned as to OAG - Edward L. Marshall re: 6 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4)
November 20, 2019 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 11/19/2019 re: 5 Document(s) Sent, filed. (jdav, 4)
November 20, 2019 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 11/19/2019 re: 6 Document(s) Sent, filed. (jdav, 4)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Answer: The Clerk shall serve a copy of the #1 petition and this Order upon Lorie Davis and Office of Attorney General, Attn: Edward L. Marshall; Answer due for Lorie Davis 1/14/2019. Order Denying as moot #2 MOTION for Leave to File Writ for Habeas Corpus Application. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
November 14, 2019 Initial Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number HOU092274, filed. (GloriaVasquez, 4)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Lamonn Eugene Blunt, filed.(sguevara, 4)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Writ for Habeas Corpus Application by Lamonn Eugene Blunt, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JenniferOlson, 4)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Lamonn Eugene Blunt. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(JenniferOlson, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blunt v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Represented By: Lori Denise Brodbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lamonn Eugene Blunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?