Ahmadi v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Reza Ahmadi
Defendant: Denise Williams, David G. Gutierrez and Lorie Davis
Case Number: 4:2019cv04147
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the full appellate filing fee of $505. Plaintiff may move to proceed in forma pauperis with the appellate court.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Non-Compliance. Appellant has failed to: Pay the notice of appeal filing fee. Parties notified, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Reza Ahmadi. No hearings /Transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. This order form relates to the following: #7 Notice of Appeal, filed.(jdav, 4)
November 26, 2019 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 19-20793 re: #7 Notice of Appeal, filed. (rnieto, 1)
November 19, 2019 Appeal Review Notes re: #7 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid. The appeal filing fee has not been paid, and appellant is a pro se litigant.A motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending.No hearings were held in the case - no transcripts., filed.(dbenavides, 1)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #8 MOTION for Leave to File Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #7 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by Reza Ahmadi, filed. (SandraSilva, 7)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Reza Ahmadi, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/5/2019. (SandraSilva, 7)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #5 Order of Dismissal, #6 Final Judgment by Reza Ahmadi, filed.(SandraSilva, 7)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on October 31, 2019(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The civil action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is warned that further sanctions may be issued if he continues to file additional frivolous, duplicative or malicious civil actions. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Reza Ahmadi, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Reza Ahmadi, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Bank Statement)(JenniferOlson, 4)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Reza Ahmadi. (Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibits A-F, #3 Exhibits G-J, #4 Exhbits K-N, #5 Envelope)(JenniferOlson, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmadi v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reza Ahmadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?