Vargas v. Rigid Global Buildings, LLC DO NOT DOCKET. THIS CASE HAS BEEN REMANDED.
Plaintiff: Antonio Vargas
Defendant: Rigid Global Buildings, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04208
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REMAND. Case terminated on 11/25/2019(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT, filed by Antonio Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Proposed Order)(Lee, Joshua)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Antonio Vargas, filed.(Armstrong, Scott)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Antonio Vargas, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement)(Lee, Joshua)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Rigid Global Buildings, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2019. (Zopolsky, Joseph)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rigid Global Buildings, LLC identifying Jin Huan Manufacturing, Inc.; Jai Shi Enterprises Company, Inc.; Evergreen Cypress Enterprises as Corporate Parent, filed.(Zopolsky, Joseph)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 127th District Court, case number 2019-72919 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23439963) filed by Rigid Global Buildings, LLC.(Zopolsky, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Rigid Global Buildings, LLC DO NOT DOCKET. THIS CASE HAS BEEN REMANDED.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rigid Global Buildings, LLC
Represented By: Joseph David Zopolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Vargas
Represented By: Joshua D. Lee
Represented By: Steve Waldman
Represented By: Scott Parker Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?