Universal Music Corporation et al v. P.O.E.T.S. Billiards, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corporation, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc. and M L E Music
Defendant: P.O.E.T.S. Billiards, Inc. and John R. Wine
Case Number: 4:2019cv04223
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to John R. Wine served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019, filed.(McDaniel, Jeff)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to P.O.E.T.S. Billiards, Inc. served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019, filed.(McDaniel, Jeff)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Heaven on behalf of M L E Music, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., filed. (Goetzel, Dwayne)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dwayne K. Goetzel on behalf of M L E Music, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., filed. (Goetzel, Dwayne)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (MelissaMorgan, 4)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by M L E Music, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., filed.(McDaniel, Jeff)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to P.O.E.T.S. Billiards, Inc., John R. Wine. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to P.O.E.T.S. Billiards, Inc., John R. Wine, filed.(McDaniel, Jeff)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M L E Music, Universal Music Corporation, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc. identifying for Universal Music Corporation and Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc. Universal Music Group and Vivendi SA as Corporate Parent, filed.(McDaniel, Jeff)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against P.O.E.T.S. Billiards, Inc., John R. Wine (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23443834) filed by Universal Music Corporation, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., M L E Music. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDaniel, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Music Corporation et al v. P.O.E.T.S. Billiards, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corporation
Represented By: Jeff Anthony McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Anthony McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M L E Music
Represented By: Jeff Anthony McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O.E.T.S. Billiards, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Wine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?