Quantum I-10 Partners, LP dba Holiday Inn Express v. Western World Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Quantum I-10 Partners, LP dba Holiday Inn Express
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04284
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Management ORDER. By 1/20/20, the parties must have exchanged the documents. By 1/31/20, the parties must jointly report if they will mediate. If not, they must report the next steps to advance this litigation. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by Western World Insurance Company, filed.(Hogue, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Management ORDER. By 12/16/2019, Quantum I-10 must give Western World every document is has concerning the condition of its property as ordered. By 12/20/2019, the parties must jointly report the status of this case and the next steps to advance this litigation. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Initial conference held. Appearances: Sean Patterson, Robert Hogue. Ct Reporter: K. Miller. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 12/23/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Western World Insurance Company, filed.(Hogue, Robert)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Western World Insurance Company, filed.(Hogue, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Serving Rule 26 Disclosures to Defendant by Quantum I-10 Partners, LP dba Holiday Inn Express, filed. (Patterson, Sean)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Quantum I-10 Partners, LP dba Holiday Inn Express, filed.(Patterson, Sean)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 334th District Court, case number 2019-70787 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23474664) filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hogue, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quantum I-10 Partners, LP dba Holiday Inn Express v. Western World Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quantum I-10 Partners, LP dba Holiday Inn Express
Represented By: Sean Michael Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert G Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?