Williams et al v. Dawkins et al
Plaintiff: julian harvey and brandon williams
Defendant: JET Lending, Inc, JM Carty Holdings, LLC, C Lugrand-Dawkins Enterprises, LLC, Fern Dawkins, Christopher Dawkins and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 4:2019cv04299
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christina A Bryan
Referring Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs claims against C Legrand-Dawkins Enterprises LLC be SEVERED from this case; that #3 Plaintiffs Motion to Remand be GRANTED as to all Defendants other than C Legrand-Dawkins Enterprises LLC; and Plaintiffs case against all remaining Defendants be REMANDED to the state court from which it was removed. Objections to M&R due by 1/2/2020(Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(cjan, 4)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The Court has been advised that the Defendant C. Lugrand-Dawkins Enterprises LLC is under the protection of the automatic stay in Bankruptcy. Accordingly, the captioned case shall be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED as to this Defendant only. The parties are granted leave to move to reinstate the case on the Court's active docket at such time in the future as the parties deem appropriate. A copy of this Order shall be attached as an exhibit to any motion to reinstate.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by C Lugrand-Dawkins Enterprises, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Bankruptcy Filing)(Newark, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by Julian Harvey, Brandon Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand letter, #2 Exhibit Email communications, #3 Exhibit Email communications, #4 Exhibit Email communications)(Vilt, Robert)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District in Harris County, TX, case number 2019-71371 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23481269) filed by C Lugrand-Dawkins Enterprises, LLC.(Newark, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Dawkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JET Lending, Inc
Represented By: Michael D Matthews, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM Carty Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Lugrand-Dawkins Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Robert C Newark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fern Dawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Dawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: julian harvey
Represented By: Robert Clayton Vilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: brandon williams
Represented By: Robert Clayton Vilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?