Impact Precision Golf, Inc. v. Precision Golf Academy, LLC
Plaintiff: Impact Precision Golf, Inc.
Defendant: Precision Golf Academy, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04304
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Precision Golf Academy, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(mmapps, 4)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Precision Golf Academy, LLC, filed.(Adams, Leslie)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Precision Golf Academy, LLC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019, filed.(Jaasma, Keith)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Precision Golf Academy, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Precision Golf Academy, LLC, filed.(Jaasma, Keith)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Impact Precision Golf, Inc., filed.(Jaasma, Keith)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MelissaMorganadi, 4)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Precision Golf Academy. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23482120) filed by Impact Precision Golf, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Complaint, #2 Exhibit to Complaint)(Jaasma, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impact Precision Golf, Inc. v. Precision Golf Academy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impact Precision Golf, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Duane Jaasma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Golf Academy, LLC
Represented By: Leslie Wm Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?