Eggenschwiller v. Skechers U.S.A. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Constance Eggenschwiller
Defendant: Skecher USA Retail, LLC and Skechers U.S.A. Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04420
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 First INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Constance Eggenschwiller, filed.(Link, Scott)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Skecher USA Retail, LLC, Skechers U.S.A. Inc., filed.(De Santos, Laura)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 09:15 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 281st Harris County District Court, case number 2019-69597 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23534017) filed by Skechers U.S.A. Inc., Skecher USA Retail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Index of State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 List of Attorneys)(De Santos, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eggenschwiller v. Skechers U.S.A. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skecher USA Retail, LLC
Represented By: Laura E. De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skechers U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Laura E. De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Eggenschwiller
Represented By: Scott Reiter Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?