Page v. Commissioner Of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dina Elizabeth Page
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv04435
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service Executed as to U S Attorney General on Summons re: 12/1/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Dina Elizabeth Page, filed.(bwhite, 4)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel served on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/21/2020, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 USM-285 RETURN of Service Executed as to US Attorney Office - Houston on 11/19/19 re: Summons, filed.(sanderson, 4)
November 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, US Attorney General, and US Attorney's Office -Houston. Issued summons delivered to the Unites States Marshal's Office by USM 285 Form., filed.(jguajardo, 4)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security filed by Dina Elizabeth Page. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (jguajardo, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Elizabeth Page
Represented By: Melissa A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?