Consolidated Wealth Holdings, Inc. et al v. Vincent et al
Plaintiff: Granite Financial, Inc., Consolidated Wealth Holdings, Inc., Consolidated Wealth Management, Ltd., Coordinated Wealth Management, LLC and John E. Spalding
Defendant: Sandra Vincent and Kyle O'Neal
Case Number: 4:2019cv04437
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Michael L. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Michael L. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sandra Vincent, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2020. (Langston, Keith)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Wilson, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23540381) filed by Granite Financial, Inc., Consolidated Wealth Holdings, Inc., Coordinated Wealth Management, LLC, Consolidated Wealth Management, Ltd., John E. Spalding. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consolidated Wealth Holdings, Inc. et al v. Vincent et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Vincent
Represented By: Michael L Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle O'Neal
Represented By: Michael L Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Michael McClure Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Wealth Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael McClure Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Wealth Management, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael McClure Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coordinated Wealth Management, LLC
Represented By: Michael McClure Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Spalding
Represented By: Michael McClure Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?