Anwar Younus v. Tidwell Fuels Service LLC et al
Plaintiff: Muhammad Bilal Anwar Younus
Defendant: Shahid Kheerani, Sugarland Fuel Services, L.L.C. d/b/a Express Fuel #5 and d/b/a West Belfort Shell, Tidwell Fuels Service LLC d/b/a Express Fuel #4, Sugarland Fuel Services, L.L.C. and Tidwell Fuels Service LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04446
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Shahid Kheerani, Sugarland Fuel Services, L.L.C., Tidwell Fuels Service LLC, filed.(Flynn, Patrick)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Muhammad Bilal Anwar Younus. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Muhammad Bilal Anwar Younus.(Martin, Lionel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service, #2 Return of Service)(Martin, Lionel)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Shahid Kheerani, Sugarland Fuel Services, L.L.C., Tidwell Fuels Service LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(jdav, 4)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Martin, Lionel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23543051) filed by Muhammad Bilal Anwar Younus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Lionel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anwar Younus v. Tidwell Fuels Service LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shahid Kheerani
Represented By: Patrick M Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sugarland Fuel Services, L.L.C. d/b/a Express Fuel #5 and d/b/a West Belfort Shell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidwell Fuels Service LLC d/b/a Express Fuel #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sugarland Fuel Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Patrick M Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidwell Fuels Service LLC
Represented By: Patrick M Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Bilal Anwar Younus
Represented By: Lionel Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?