Series 4 - Virage Master, LP v. VLASAC & SHMARUK, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Series 4 - Virage Master, LP
Defendant: VLASAC & SHMARUK, LLC, Boris Shmaruk and John M. Vlasac, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04537
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 4/16/2020. Pltf Expert Report due by 4/16/2020. Deft Expert Witness List due by 5/17/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 5/17/2020. Discovery due by 7/17/2020. Motion Filing due by 8/17/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/16/2020. Docket Call set for 12/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. Trial set for 12/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
February 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/7/2020. Dates agreed, scheduling order to follow. Appearances: Ashish Mahendru, Aaron Douglas Davidson.(Court Reporter: K. Metzger), filed.(ledwards, 4)
January 28, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Series 4 - Virage Master, LP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Scheduling/Docket Control Order)(Mahendru, Ashish)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Series 4 - Virage Master, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Declaration of Ashish Mahendru, #2 Exhibit B--Mahendru Email)(Mahendru, Ashish)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Boris Shmaruk by Boris Shmaruk, VLASAC & SHMARUK, LLC, John M. Vlasac, Jr., filed. (Davidson, Aaron)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction re: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Boris Shmaruk, VLASAC & SHMARUK, LLC, John M. Vlasac, Jr., filed. (Davidson, Aaron)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Davidson on behalf of Boris Shmaruk, VLASAC & SHMARUK, LLC, John M. Vlasac, Jr., filed. (Davidson, Aaron)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Series 4 - Virage Master, LP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B--Sealed Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit D--Sealed Security Agreement) (Mahendru, Ashish)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Series 4 - Virage Master, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Declaration of Martin A. Shellist, #2 Exhibit B--Loan Agreement Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C--Boris Shmaruk Email, #4 Exhibit D--Security Agreement Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit E--Boris Shmaruk Email, #6 Exhibit F--Provident Bank Notification, #7 Exhibit G--Provident Bank Statements, #8 Proposed Order)(Mahendru, Ashish)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Series 4 - Virage Master, LP, filed.(Mahendru, Ashish)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Boris Shmaruk, VLASAC & SHMARUK, LLC, John M. Vlasac, Jr., filed.(Walker, James)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marilyn Burgess-District Clerk Harris County, case number 2019-79577 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23598749) filed by Boris Shmaruk, John M. Vlasac, Jr., VLASAC & SHMARUK, LLC.(Walker, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Series 4 - Virage Master, LP v. VLASAC & SHMARUK, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VLASAC & SHMARUK, LLC
Represented By: James W Walker
Represented By: Ian Ross Phillips
Represented By: Aaron Douglas Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boris Shmaruk
Represented By: James W Walker
Represented By: Ian Ross Phillips
Represented By: Aaron Douglas Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Vlasac, Jr.
Represented By: James W Walker
Represented By: Ian Ross Phillips
Represented By: Aaron Douglas Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series 4 - Virage Master, LP
Represented By: Ashish Mahendru
Represented By: Darren Andrew Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?