Nichols v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Eric Nichols
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04582
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Eric Nichols, filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020, filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Eric Nichols, filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Coleman on behalf of Eric Nichols, filed. (Coleman, Eric)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro E. Figueroa on behalf of Eric Nichols, filed. (Figueroa, Alejandro)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Eric Nichols, filed. (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Volheim on behalf of Eric Nichols, filed. (Volheim, Nathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23627930) filed by Eric Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Nichols
Represented By: Eric Donald Coleman
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Represented By: Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?