Bryan v. Saul
Plaintiff: Cloteal A Bryan
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv04627
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Referring Judge: Frances H Stacy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Andrew Saul served on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of Service Executed as to US Attorney General on 12/31/19 re: Complaint and Summons, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Andrew Saul served on 12/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020, filed.(CarrieDickie, 6)
December 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, USM 285, copy of complaint and copy of Order granting IFP forwarded to the USM for service., filed.(jdav, 4)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 26, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to Andrew Saul as summons not provided. Attorney for Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Application to Proceed IFP Granted on 11/25/2019 by The Honorable Lynn N. Hughes). filed by Cloteal A Bryan.(jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cloteal A Bryan
Represented By: James Foster Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?