The United States of America For the Use and Benefit of Rovan Texas, LLC v. H20 Construction Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The United States of America For the Use and Benefit of Rovan Texas, LLC
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA and H20 Construction Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04675
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Intradistrict Transfer to Brownsville, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Case to Brownsville Division.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Brownsville Division by The United States of America For the Use and Benefit of Rovan Texas, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Case to Southern District - Brownsville Division)(Farwell, Jay)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4)
November 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to H20 Construction Services, Inc., The Guarantee Company of North America USA. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Plaintiffs, filed.(O'Rourke, Stephanie)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23660022) filed by The United States of America For the Use and Benefit of Rovan Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(O'Rourke, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America For the Use and Benefit of Rovan Texas, LLC v. H20 Construction Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America For the Use and Benefit of Rovan Texas, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Lyn O'Rourke
Represented By: Jay K Farwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H20 Construction Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?